EP3981984 - METERING PUMP AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A METERING PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundfos Holding A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7-11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerz, Sergei 76327 Wöschbach (Pfinztal) / DE | 02 /
Kechler, Valeri 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2022/15] | Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 21208771.2 | 06.07.2018 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981984 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3981984 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04B13/00, F04B49/06, F04B51/00, // F04B17/03, F04B49/10 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
F04B13/00 (EP,US);
F04B43/04 (US);
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
F04B51/00 (EP);
F04B17/03 (EP);
F04B2201/0201 (EP,US);
F04B2201/1208 (EP);
F04B2203/0207 (EP,US);
F04B2205/03 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DOSIERPUMPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER DOSIERPUMPE | [2022/15] | English: | METERING PUMP AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A METERING PUMP | [2022/15] | French: | POMPE DE MESURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE POMPE DE MESURE | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 10.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18182262.8 / EP3591226 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5201636 (MIKULSKI HENRY [US]); | [XAYI]US2004167738 (MILLER J DAVIS [US]); | [XAY]US2007041845 (FREUDENBERGER THOMAS [DE]); | [XAYI]US2016177937 (LIU STEVEN [DE], et al); | [YA]WO2018044293 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) | by applicant | DE102011000569 | US2015159646 |