EP4016475 - DISTANCE DETECTION SYSTEM AND DISTANCE DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pegatron Corporation 5F., 76 Ligong St. Beitou District Taipei City 112 / TW | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Po-Ching Taipei City 112 / TW | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 21208931.2 | 18.11.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | TW20200144212 | 15.12.2020 Original published format: TW 109144212 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016475 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/56, G01S7/481, G01S7/484, G01S7/499, G01S17/10 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G06V20/56 (EP);
G01S11/12 (CN);
G01S7/4815 (EP,US);
G01S17/08 (EP);
G01S17/89 (US);
G01S17/931 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABSTANDSERKENNUNG | [2022/25] | English: | DISTANCE DETECTION SYSTEM AND DISTANCE DETECTION METHOD | [2022/25] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE DISTANCE | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 28.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016187471 (FENDT GUENTER ANTON [DE]) [I] 1-11* paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0 13] , [0022] - [0029] - [0037]; figures 1-4 * |