EP4006893 - IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dohoon 08592 Seoul / KR | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 21208949.4 | 18.11.2021 | [2022/22] | Priority number, date | KR20200161467 | 26.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200161467 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4006893 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, H02M7/02 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G09G3/3696 (EP);
H04N5/63 (CN,KR);
G09G3/2096 (US);
G09G3/3426 (US);
H02M1/0022 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP);
H02M1/008 (EP);
H02M1/0085 (EP);
H02M1/36 (EP);
H02M1/4233 (EP);
H02M3/00 (EP);
H02M7/219 (EP);
H04N23/66 (CN);
H04N5/911 (CN);
G09G2310/08 (EP);
G09G2320/066 (US);
G09G2330/021 (US);
G09G2330/025 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2330/028 (EP);
G09G2330/06 (EP,US);
H02M1/0009 (EP);
H02M7/062 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/22] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2022/22] | French: | AFFICHEUR D'IMAGES | [2022/22] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - FIRMANSYAH E ET AL, "A critical-conduction-mode bridgeless interleaved boost power factor correction", INTELEC 09 : 31ST INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENERGY CONFERENCE ; INCHEON, KOREA, 18 - 22 OCTOBER 2009, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091018), ISBN 978-1-4244-2490-0, pages 1 - 5, XP031579345 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - EKA FIRMANSYAH ET AL, "Totem-Pole Power-Factor-Correction Converter under Critical-Conduction-Mode Interleaved Operation", IEICE TRANSACTION ON COMMUNICATION, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20100901), vol. E93B, no. 9, doi:10.1587/TRANSCOM.E93.B.2250, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 2250 - 2256, XP001558540 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1587/transcom.E93.B.2250 | [I] - NARADHIPA ADHISTIRA MADHYASTA ET AL, "A New Single-Stage Bridgeless Boost Half-Bridge AC/DC Converter with Semi-Active-Rectifier", 2019 IEEE APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION (APEC), IEEE, (20190317), doi:10.1109/APEC.2019.8722217, pages 757 - 762, XP033555248 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2019.8722217 |