EP3998495 - PASSIVE RADAR FOR PRESENCE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILIPPI, Alessio 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SREEDHARAN NAIR, Biju, Kumar 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
PASVEER, Willem, Franke 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
VAN BERKEL, Teun, Martinus, Johannes 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21209048.4 | 09.04.2009 | [2022/20] | Priority number, date | US20080045296 | 16.04.2008 Original published format: US 45296 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3998495 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/56, G01S7/35, G01S13/88 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G01S13/003 (EP,US);
G01S13/56 (EP);
G01S13/886 (EP,US);
G01S7/006 (EP);
G01S7/354 (EP,US);
H05B47/115 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/52] |
Former [2022/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PASSIVRADAR ZUR ERKENNUNG VON ANWESENHEIT | [2022/19] | English: | PASSIVE RADAR FOR PRESENCE DETECTION | [2022/19] | French: | RADAR PASSIF POUR DÉTECTION DE PRÉSENCE | [2022/19] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 18.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09732632.6 / EP2269092 | EP17160844.1 / EP3211451 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005285787 (DELAVEAU FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0241]; figures 2,7; table 1 *; | [A]US2008018521 (SAHINOGLU ZAFER [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A] - David K. Barton, "Contant False Alarm Rate", RADAR TECHNOLOGY ENCYCLOPEDIA., US, BOSTON, MA : ARTECH HOUSE., (19980101), pages 91 - 91, ISBN 978-0-89006-893-9, XP055382127 [A] 1 * CFAR entry * | [AD] - MASAHIRO NISHI ET AL, "Indoor Human Detection Systems Using VHF-FM and UHF-TV Broadcasting Waves", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2006 IEEE 17TH INTER NATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20060901), ISBN 978-1-4244-0329-5, pages 1 - 5, XP031023893 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | - NISHI, M.TAKAHASHI, S.YOSHIDA, T., "Indoor Human Detection Systems Using VHF-FM and UHF-TV Broadcasting Waves", Personal, Indoor and Mobile Radio Communications, 2006 IEEE 17th International Symposium, (20060900), pages 1 - 5, XP031023893 |