EP4184290 - SECURE AUGMENTED REALITY PROGRAMMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jens, Müller 14195 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Thomas, Dörr 12437 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Miro, Selent 14558 Nuthetal / DE | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7-9 12359 Berlin / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21209315.7 | 19.11.2021 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184290 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERER PROGRAMMIERER FÜR ERWEITERTE REALITÄT | [2023/21] | English: | SECURE AUGMENTED REALITY PROGRAMMER | [2023/21] | French: | PROGRAMMATEUR DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE SÉCURISÉE | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/17] | 15.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002099422 (FEREK-PETRIC BOZIDAR [HR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0072] - [0073]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2005159787 (LINBERG KURT R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0074] , [0082] , [0085]; figures 4,7a,7b *; | [A]US2015142090 (DUIJSENS VICTOR [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0071] - [0079] *; | [A]US2016330573 (MASOUD JAVAID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0048] , [0074] - [0076]; figure 8b *; | [XI]US2017259072 (NEWHAM ADAM EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0031] , [0044] , [0047] , [0054] , [0060] , [0064] - [0066] - [0076]; figure 4 * [I] 2-5,9,10; | [A]US2018243573 (YODER MATTHEW R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0047] , [0057] *; | [A]US2020139140 (CRAWFORD CHRISTOPHER S L [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0039] *; | [A]US2021058257 (PEPIN BRIAN MARC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0075] , [0094] , [0096] , [0098] - [0100] - [0138] * |