EP3981696 - FLOW WRAPPER APPARATUS WITH FORMING TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amcor Flexibles North America, Inc. 2301 Industrial Drive Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [2023/36] |
Former [2022/15] | For all designated states Moda IP Limited 15A Parkside Street St Heliers, Auckland 1071 / NZ | ||
For all designated states Newcombe, Richard Guyon 15a Parkside Street St Heliers, Auckland 1071 / NZ | |||
For all designated states Melville, Alexander Richard c/o 15a Parkside St St Heliers, Auckland 1071 / NZ | |||
For all designated states Noakes, Daniel c/o 15a Parkside Street St Heliers, Auckland 1071 / NZ | |||
For all designated states Wright, Hayden c/o 15a Parkside Street St Heliers, Auckland 1071 / NZ | |||
For all designated states Frietsch, Thomas c/o 15a Parkside St St Heliers, Auckland 1071 / NZ | |||
For all designated states Donovan, Ryan c/o 15a Parkside Street St Heliers, Auckland 1071 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWCOMBE, Richard Guyon 1071 St Heliers, Auckland / NZ | 02 /
MELVILLE, Alexander Richard 1071 St Heliers, Auckland / NZ | 03 /
NOAKES, Daniel 1071 St Heliers, Auckland / NZ | 04 /
WRIGHT, Hayden 1071 St Heliers, Auckland / NZ | 05 /
FRIETSCH, Thomas 1071 St Heliers, Auckland / NZ | 06 /
DONOVAN, Ryan 1071 St Heliers, Auckland / NZ | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/15] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21209342.1 | 25.04.2017 | [2022/15] | Priority number, date | NZ20080167198 | 05.05.2016 Original published format: NZ 16719808 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981696 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3981696 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/22, B65B9/20, B65B41/16, B65B25/06, B65B61/02, B65B9/073 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
B65B9/22 (EP,US);
B65B25/065 (EP,US);
B65B41/16 (EP);
B65B61/025 (EP);
B65B9/073 (EP);
B65B9/2028 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHBEUTELVORRICHTUNG MIT FORMROHR | [2022/15] | English: | FLOW WRAPPER APPARATUS WITH FORMING TUBE | [2022/15] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENSACHEUSE TUBULAIRE | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17792935.3 / EP3452373 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4658569 (HANAGATA TOSHIYUKI [JP]); | [A]US2006179798 (THORPE CHARLES C [US]); | [Y]US2009035496 (NAKAGAWA YUKIO [JP], et al); | [A]EP2258627 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [Y]US2013097966 (HONEGGER CHRIS ALLEN [US]); | [A]US2014318081 (KNÖPFEL HANS [CH]) | by applicant | US5417041 | US5448758 | US6185907 | US2016288937 |