EP4008884 - VARIABLE GUIDE VANE ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, LV, NO, PL, RS, SE | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA CORP. 1000 Marie Victorin, (01BE5) Longueuil, Québec J4G 1A1 / CA | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POICK, Daniel (01BE5) Longueuil, J4G 1A1 / CA | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/23] | Application number, filing date | 21209382.7 | 19.11.2021 | [2022/23] | Priority number, date | US202017108937 | 01.12.2020 Original published format: US202017108937 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4008884 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4008884 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/16, F04D29/56 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
F01D17/162 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (US);
F01D9/042 (US);
F04D29/563 (EP);
F05D2240/128 (US);
F05D2260/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] |
Former [2022/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARE LEITSCHAUFELANORDNUNG FÜR EIN GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK UND GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK | [2022/23] | English: | VARIABLE GUIDE VANE ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2022/23] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'AUBES DIRECTRICES VARIABLES POUR UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ET MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2023/27] |
Former [2022/23] | ENSEMBLE D'AUBES DIRECTRICES VARIABLES POUR MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ET MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | Examination procedure | 08.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 08.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3224194 (DE FEO ANGELO, et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15 * figure 3 *[I] 6,14; | [XI]EP0909880 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-13,15 * figures 2-4 * [I] 6,14; | [XI]EP1808579 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-13,15 * figure 3 * [I] 6,14; | [XI]EP3228822 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-13,15 * figures 24,25,26,27,29 * [I] 6,14 |