EP4183380 - PATIENT-SPECIFIC, DRUG RELEASING, COMPRESSIBLE IMPLANT WITH IN-TEGRATED HANDLE FOR INSERTION INTO A BODY CAVITY AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medizinische Hochschule Hannover Carl-Neuberg-Straße 1 30625 Hannover / DE | For all designated states HörSys GmbH Feodor-Lynen-Strasse 35 30625 Hannover / DE | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEPER, Verena 31555 Suthfeld / DE | 02 /
DOLL, Theodor 30916 Isernhagen / DE | 03 /
MATIN, Farnaz 30175 Hannover / DE | 04 /
John, Samuel 30559 Hannover / DE | 05 /
LENARZ, Thomas 30559 Hannover / DE | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Plathnerstraße 3A 30175 Hannover / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21209553.3 | 22.11.2021 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4183380 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F11/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y80/00 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
A61F11/00 (EP);
B33Y50/00 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
A61F2210/0004 (EP);
A61F2240/002 (EP);
A61F2250/0018 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHES, ARZNEIMITTELFREISETZENDES, KOMPRIMIERBARES IMPLANTAT MIT INTEGRIERTEM HANDGRIFF ZUM EINSETZEN IN EINE KÖRPERHÖHLE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2023/21] | English: | PATIENT-SPECIFIC, DRUG RELEASING, COMPRESSIBLE IMPLANT WITH IN-TEGRATED HANDLE FOR INSERTION INTO A BODY CAVITY AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | [2023/21] | French: | IMPLANT COMPRESSIBLE SPÉCIFIQUE AU PATIENT, À LIBÉRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS DOTÉ D'UNE POIGNÉE INTÉGRÉE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE INSÉRÉ DANS UNE CAVITÉ CORPORELLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/17] | 18.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9856434 (INTRAEAR INC [US], et al) [Y] 3-5 * page 52, line 29 - line 33; figures 5,6 * * page 53, line 26 - line 34 *; | [XYI]WO0033775 (DURECT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,10-12,14 * page 4, line 22 - line 31 * * page 11, line 18 - line 24 * * page 36, line 3 - line 4; figure 5 * * page 18, line 30 - line 33 * * page 18, line 26 - line 28 * * page 26, line 3 - line 5 * [Y] 3-5,8,9,15,16 [I] 13; | [Y]WO03030787 (THERICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 8,9,15,16 * page 19, line 26 - line 30 * * page 3, line 2 - line 24 * * page 19, line 19 - line 24 *; | [A]WO2017203397 (COCHLEAR LTD [AU]) [A] 6 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1B, 1C *; | [A] - MATIN FARNAZ ET AL, "Determination of the Round Window Niche Anatomy Using Cone Beam Computed Tomography Imaging as Preparatory Work for Individualized Drug-Releasing Implants", JOURNAL OF IMAGING, (20210426), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.3390/jimaging7050079, page 79, XP055915294 [A] 14,15 * page 8, paragraphs 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/jimaging7050079 |