EP4102382 - DETERMINATION OF CANDIDATE FEATURES FOR DEVIATION ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Business Objects Software Ltd. 1012-1014 Kingswood Avenue Citywest Business Campus Dublin 24 / IE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'HARA, Paul 69190 Walldorf / DE | 02 /
KAUFMANN, Malte Christian 69190 Walldorf / DE | 03 /
BANERJEE, Anirban 69190 Walldorf / DE | 04 /
DENVER, Ian 69190 Walldorf / DE | 05 /
McSHANE, Alan 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21209830.5 | 23.11.2021 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | US202117342812 | 09.06.2021 Original published format: US202117342812 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102382 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/18, G06Q30/00 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
G06F17/18 (EP);
G06F16/2462 (US);
G06F16/2465 (US);
G06F16/285 (US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG VON KANDIDATENMERKMALEN FÜR ABWEICHUNGSANALYSE | [2022/50] | English: | DETERMINATION OF CANDIDATE FEATURES FOR DEVIATION ANALYSIS | [2022/50] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'UN CANDIDAT POUR ANALYSE D'ÉCART | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 01.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - JIANG SHENG-YI ET AL, "Efficient feature selection based on correlation measure between continuous and discrete features", INFORMATION PROCESSING LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150717), vol. 116, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.IPL.2015.07.005, ISSN 0020-0190, pages 203 - 215, XP029316224 [X] 6 * sections 3-5 * [I] 1-5,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ipl.2015.07.005 |