EP3998165 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR OPERATING A PRINTER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hand Held Products, Inc. 855 S Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2023/35] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Datamax-O'Neil Corporation 9680 Old Bailes Road Fort Mill, SC 29707 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOETZ, Slawek Lake Forest, 92630 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21210331.1 | 29.03.2019 | [2022/20] | Priority number, date | US201815947351 | 06.04.2018 Original published format: US201815947351 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3998165 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045, B41J2/14 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/3555 (US);
B41J2/04513 (EP,US);
B41J2/04515 (EP,US);
B41J2/04536 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM BETRIEB EINER DRUCKERVORRICHTUNG | [2022/19] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR OPERATING A PRINTER APPARATUS | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL D'IMPRIMANTE | [2022/19] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 14.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19166401.0 / EP3549771 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6158835 (JACKSON LEE W [US], et al); | [A]US2002113831 (SU WEN-LI [US], et al); | [XI]US2003025746 (VEGA RAMON [ES]); | [A]US2003081024 (VIVES JOAN CARLES [US], et al); | [A]US2005052483 (ESAKI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [XI]US2017036441 (HOLSTUN CLAYTON L [US], et al); | [XPI]US2018141331 (TAKATA ATSUSHI [JP]) |