EP4008354 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Variation Biotechnologies Inc. 200 rue Montcalm Suite 400 Gatineau QC J8Y 3B5 / CA | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRCHMEIER, Marc, J. Harleysville, PA 19438 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, David, E. Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Bryers Intellectual Property Ltd Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent, Emerson's Green Bristol, BS16 7FR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Bryers LLP Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent, Emerson's Green Bristol, BS16 7FR / GB | Application number, filing date | 21211173.6 | 25.01.2013 | [2022/23] | Priority number, date | US201261591837P | 27.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261591837 P | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4008354 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/28, A61K39/00, A61K47/14, A61K47/24, A61K9/19, A61K39/12, A61K39/165, A61K39/20, A61K39/295, A61K39/395, A61K9/127, C07K16/32, C12N7/00 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A61K39/0015 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (RU);
A61K47/14 (US);
A61K39/00 (RU);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/165 (EP,US);
A61K39/20 (EP,US);
A61K39/295 (US);
A61K39/39591 (EP,US);
A61K47/24 (RU,US);
A61K47/28 (RU,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US);
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18434 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR THERAPEUTIKA | [2022/23] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2022/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2022/23] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 29.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/21] | 05.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13741121.1 / EP2806894 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9319781 (PROTEUS MOLECULAR DESIGN [GB], et al); | [I]WO9509651 (PROTEUS MOLECULAR DESIGN [GB], et al); | [XI]WO9704768 (PROTEUS MOLECULAR DESIGN [GB], et al); | [A]CA2258907 (NOVAVAX INC [US]); | [A]US2010226932 (SMITH GAIL [US], et al); | [I]WO2011005769 (VARIATION BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al); | [I]CA2767392 (VARIATION BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]); | [A]CA2803282 (VARIATION BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]); | [I]WO2012006368 (VARIATION BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al); | [YP]WO2012097347 (VARIATION BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al); | [YP]WO2012097346 (VARIATION BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al); | by applicant | WO8806882 | US6290967 |