EP4187110 - JOINT CONNECTOR FOR CONNECTING A PLURALITY OF COMPONENTS IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTHIEN, Hermann 21129 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
POPPE, Andreas 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21211300.5 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187110 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/00 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
F16B7/00 (EP);
B64D2011/0046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELENKVERBINDER ZUM VERBINDEN MEHRERER BAUTEILE IN EINEM VERKEHRSMITTEL | [2023/22] | English: | JOINT CONNECTOR FOR CONNECTING A PLURALITY OF COMPONENTS IN A VEHICLE | [2023/22] | French: | CONNECTEUR D'ARTICULATION PERMETTANT DE RELIER PLUSIEURS COMPOSANTS DANS UN MOYEN DE TRANSPORT | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 16.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001289211 (TAIKO KK); | [XD]DE19839701 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE19633469 | DE19839701 |