EP4186442 - SURGICAL DEVICE WITH BUCKLING WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/22] | SURGICAL DEVICE, DEVICE FOR PRE-BENDING A BUCKLING WIRE, METHOD FOR FELTING AN IMPLANT TO SOFT TISSUE, AND METHOD FOR PRE-BENDING A BUCKLING WIRE | ||
[2024/13] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZuriMED Technologies AG Lengghalde 5 8008 Zürich / CH | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANZET, Pol 6006 Zürich / CH | 02 /
GRAF, Reto 8052 Zürich / CH | 03 /
BACHMANN, Elias 8049 Zürich / CH | 04 /
LI, Xiang 8610 Uster / CH | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21211467.2 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186442 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4186442 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, A61B17/062, // A61B90/00, A61B17/00, A61B17/06 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
A61B17/0625 (EP);
A61B17/0491 (EP);
A61B90/03 (EP);
A61B2017/00535 (EP);
A61B2017/00867 (EP);
A61B2017/06042 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT KNICKDRAHT | [2024/13] | English: | SURGICAL DEVICE WITH BUCKLING WIRE | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL AVEC FIL DE BOUCLAGE | [2024/13] |
Former [2023/22] | CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG, VORRICHTUNG ZUM VORBIEGEN EINES KNICKDRAHTS, VERFAHREN ZUM FILZEN EINES IMPLANTATS AN WEICHGEWEBE UND VERFAHREN ZUM VORBIEGEN EINES KNICKDRAHTS | ||
Former [2023/22] | SURGICAL DEVICE, DEVICE FOR PRE-BENDING A BUCKLING WIRE, METHOD FOR FELTING AN IMPLANT TO SOFT TISSUE, AND METHOD FOR PRE-BENDING A BUCKLING WIRE | ||
Former [2023/22] | DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL, DISPOSITIF DE PRÉ-PLIAGE D'UN FIL DE FLAMBAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE FEUTRAGE D'UN IMPLANT SUR DES TISSUS MOUS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉ-PLIAGE D'UN FIL DE FLAMBAGE | Examination procedure | 27.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 27.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002014020 (UNIV HIROSHIMA); | [A]US2008103527 (MARTIN DAVID T [US], et al); | [A]EP3338683 (ETHICON LLC [PR]); | [A]WO2020227838 (ZURIMED TECH AG [CH]); | [A]US2021259799 (LESSARD KEVIN ALEXANDER [US], et al) | Examination | US2019365362 | EP4243702 | by applicant | WO2019CH00015 | WO2020EP81887 | WO2020EP81891 | WO2020EP81881 |