EP4029919 - PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET FOR PROTECTING SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueno, Taiki Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Mizuno, Kouji Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Shunpei Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Hayashi, Miki Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 21211776.6 | 01.12.2021 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | JP20210005037 | 15.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021005037 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4029919 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4029919 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/38, H01L21/683 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
C09J7/38 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/385 (CN,US);
C08K3/041 (US);
C08K3/042 (US);
C08K5/0075 (US);
C08K5/19 (EP,US);
C08K5/3445 (US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C08L25/18 (KR);
C08L65/00 (KR);
C09J11/00 (KR);
C09J133/066 (CN);
C09J7/29 (CN);
C09J9/00 (KR);
C09J9/02 (CN,US);
H01L21/6836 (EP,CN,KR);
C08G61/126 (US);
C08K2201/001 (EP,US);
C09J2203/326 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2301/122 (CN,US);
C09J2301/162 (CN);
C09J2301/302 (CN,US);
C09J2301/312 (EP,US);
C09J2301/314 (CN,US);
C09J2301/408 (EP,US);
C09J2423/006 (CN);
C09J2423/106 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C09J133/066, C08K5/0075 (CN);
C09J133/066, C08L65/00, C08L25/18 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] |
Former [2022/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHE KLEBEFOLIE ZUM SCHUTZ EINES HALBLEITERELEMENTS | [2022/29] | English: | PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET FOR PROTECTING SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT | [2022/29] | French: | FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION DE PROTECTION D'ÉLÉMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2500390 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract ** paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0018] - paragraphs [0023] , [0038] , [0043] , [0053]; examples 1-3; claim -; table 1 *; | [X]US2014295180 (YAMAGATA MASATO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0013] , [0025] , [0027] , [0358]; example -; claims 1-3,5,8,10 *; | [X]WO2019239925 (LINTEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0051] - paragraphs [0062] , [0064] , [0103] , [0104] , [0119]; example -; claims 1,3-9,12 * | by applicant | WO2018003893 | JP2020125436 | JP2020174201 | JP2021005037 |