EP4009483 - UNINTERRUPTIBLE POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILDER, Vincent Edward Benson, 27504 / US | 02 /
NAVARRO, George Arthur Raleigh, 27615 / US | 03 /
MOORE, Steven Andrew Raleigh, 27613 / US | 04 /
KOLGE, Amit G. 411014 Pune / IN | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2022/23] | Application number, filing date | 21212485.3 | 06.12.2021 | [2022/23] | Priority number, date | US202017112148 | 04.12.2020 Original published format: US202017112148 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4009483 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, H02J3/32, H02J7/00, H02J3/46 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
H02J9/062 (EP,CN);
H02J3/0073 (CN);
H02J3/32 (EP,CN);
H02J3/466 (EP);
H02J7/007182 (EP);
H02J13/00002 (EP);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] |
Former [2022/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERBRECHUNGSFREIES STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2022/23] | English: | UNINTERRUPTIBLE POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2022/23] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE SANS COUPURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2022/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 07.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2019067986 (HAJ-MAHARSI MOHAMED Y [SA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,13,14* paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [0025] , [0026]; figures 2,4 *; | [X]US2019280492 (HAJ-MAHARSI MOHAMED Y [SA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0044] *; | [X]US2020274367 (NAVARRO GEORGE ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0016] - [0024]; claims 1,6,9 * |