EP4191119 - HYDROGEN TANK ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE, SUCH AS AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus (S.A.S.) 2, Rond Point Emile Dewoitine 31700 Blagnac / FR | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beier, Uwe Dr. 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 02 /
Metzner, Christian 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 03 /
Geistbeck, Matthias Dr. 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 04 /
Zimmermann, Kristian Dr. 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | KASTEL Patentanwälte PartG mbB St.-Cajetan-Straße 41 81669 München / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21212634.6 | 06.12.2021 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191119 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F17C3/04 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
F17C3/04 (EP);
B64D37/30 (CN);
F17C1/005 (US);
B64D27/02 (CN);
B64D27/026 (CN);
B64D27/10 (CN);
B64D37/06 (CN);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0119 (EP);
F17C2201/0128 (EP);
F17C2201/0147 (EP);
F17C2201/054 (EP);
F17C2203/0325 (EP);
F17C2203/0329 (EP);
F17C2203/0391 (EP);
F17C2203/0604 (US);
F17C2203/0629 (US);
F17C2203/0631 (EP);
F17C2203/0634 (US);
F17C2203/0663 (EP);
F17C2209/232 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2223/013 (US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
F17C2250/043 (EP);
F17C2250/0434 (EP);
F17C2250/0439 (EP);
F17C2250/0452 (EP);
F17C2260/036 (US);
F17C2260/037 (EP);
F17C2260/038 (EP);
F17C2270/0168 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] |
Former [2023/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFTANKANORDNUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG WIE Z.B. EIN FLUGZEUG | [2023/23] | English: | HYDROGEN TANK ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE, SUCH AS AN AIRCRAFT | [2023/23] | French: | ENSEMBLE RÉSERVOIR D'HYDROGÈNE POUR UN VÉHICULE, TEL QU'UN AÉRONEF | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 01.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102015225348 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0021] , [0022] , [0038] , [0039]; figure 2 * [I] 4,7,8; | [X]US2020309324 (LAW BARNABY [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0035]; figure . *; | [X]CN112539344 (CHANGJIANG INST SURVEY PLANNING DESIGN & RES CO LTD) [X] 1* figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US10584828 | - Material & Formen unserer Vakuumisolationspaneele va-Q-tec, (20211126), URL: https://va-q-tec.com/technologie/vakuumisolationspaneele/material-formen | EP20210185667 | EP20210188290 |