EP4015202 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SOLID TYRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Continental-Plaza 1 30175 Hannover / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Vahrenwalder Str. 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Matthias-Stephan 30165 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Sauerwald, Hans-Jürgen 30165 Hannover / DE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental AG Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 21212769.0 | 07.12.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | DE202010215898 | 15.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020215898 | [2022/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4015202 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4015202 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/02, // B29D30/52 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
B29D30/02 (EP);
B29D2030/526 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VOLLREIFENS | [2022/25] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SOLID TYRE | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN BANDAGE PLEIN | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 03.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0787604 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 3 - line 51; figure - * * page 3, paragraph 18 - paragraph 40 *; | [A]EP0881060 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 30 - line 40; figures 6,7,11,12,13 * * page 4, line 47 - line 52 * * page 5, line 20 - line 59 *; | [A]EP1213383 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure - *; | [A]KR100644261B (HANKOOK TIRE MFG CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2015101737 (DETTORRE JEAN-MARIE [FR]) [A] 1-14* figure - *; | [A]WO2018001498 (ARTIC INVEST S A [LU]) [A] 3,14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figure -; claim 17 *; | [A]DE102016212509 (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 3,9 * paragraph [0027]; figure -; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP2036704 |