EP4194791 - DETERMINING A STATE-OF-CHARGE OF A PHASE-CHANGE-MATERIAL-BASED THERMAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V. 17 Firth Road Houston Industrial Estate Livingston EH54 5DJ / GB | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLKIS, Christopher Livingston, EH54 5 DJ / GB | 02 /
KAWALEY, Georgeanna Livingston, EH54 5DJ / GB | 03 /
FREEMAN, James Livingston, EH54 5DJ / GB | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21213459.7 | 09.12.2021 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194791 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F28D20/02 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
F28D20/021 (EP);
G01R31/00 (CN);
F28D20/028 (EP);
G01N25/20 (CN);
G01R31/387 (CN);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DES LADEZUSTANDS EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON THERMISCHER ENERGIE BASIEREND AUF PHASENWECHSELMATERIALIEN | [2023/24] | English: | DETERMINING A STATE-OF-CHARGE OF A PHASE-CHANGE-MATERIAL-BASED THERMAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE | [2023/24] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'UN ÉTAT DE CHARGE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE THERMIQUE À BASE DE MATÉRIAU À CHANGEMENT DE PHASE | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 16.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP2482021 (ZAE BAYERN BAYERISCHES ZENTRUM FUER ANGEWANDTE ENERGIEFORSCHUNG E V [DE]); | [A]WO2012124932 (LEE GEON-HWA [KR]); | [AD]US2014102662 (GRAMA SORIN [US], et al); | [X]US2014158340 (DIXLER KEITH [US], et al); | [A]WO2014191778 (SUNAMP LTD [GB]) | by applicant | EP2482021 | US2014102662 | EP3336473 | WO2018122392 | AU2018202778B |