EP3984953 - CARBON MICRO PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 23.02.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbon Technology Holdings, LLC 16 West 46th Street, Floor 11 New York, NY 10036 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENNELL, James, A. Minneapolis / US | 02 /
DESPEN, Daniel, J. Minneapolis, MN 55014 / US | 03 /
REAMER, David Minneapolis, MN 55401 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 21213539.6 | 16.01.2015 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | US201461928100P | 16.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461928100 P | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984953 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/30, C01B32/39, C01B32/336, B01J20/20, C10B49/02, C10B53/02, B01J20/30 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/3078 (EP,US);
C01B32/324 (US);
C01B32/336 (EP,US);
C01B32/39 (EP,US);
C01B32/50 (US);
G06Q10/04 (US);
B01J2219/00013 (EP,US);
B01J2219/24 (US);
C10B49/02 (EP,US);
C10B53/02 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (US);
Y02P20/133 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFFMIKROANLAGE | [2022/16] | English: | CARBON MICRO PLANT | [2022/16] | French: | MICRO-INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION DE CARBONE | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 07.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15737937.1 / EP3094593 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0071936 (MBR TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * examples 1-8 *; | [X]WO2009105441 (SRINIVASACHAR SRIVATS [US]) [X] 1-16 * figures 1-7; examples 1-6; claims 1-26 * * pages 9-14 *; | [X]WO2012142489 (BIOGENIC REAGENTS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * figures 1-8; examples 1-13; claims 1-76 *; | [A]US2013326935 (KIMBALL GREGORY J [US]) [A] 1-16* paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0088]; claims 1-20 *; | [A] - J Martin ET AL, "GASIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF BIOCHAR FROM WASTEWATER GROWN ALGAE", Water New Zealand Annual Conference 22-24/09/2010, (20100901), URL: https://www.waternz.org.nz/Attachment?Action=Download&Attachment_id=1127, (20170120), XP055337229 [A] 1-16 * 1.1, 1.2, 2.2.2 * |