EP4194815 - SENSOR ASSEMBLY WITH A JOYSTICK OR A THUMBSTICK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melexis Technologies SA Chemin de Buchaux 38 2022 Bevaix / CH | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIYA, Takumi Yokohama 231-0005 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroyuki Yokohama 231-0005 / JP | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Jacobs, Lambert Inventrans BV Overwegstraat 24 3740 Bilzen / BE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21213625.3 | 10.12.2021 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194815 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4194815 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
G01D5/147 (EP);
G01R33/0005 (CN);
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01B7/00 (CN);
G01B7/30 (CN);
G01D5/14 (CN);
G01D5/142 (EP,CN);
G01R33/0011 (CN);
G01R33/0047 (CN);
G01R33/0206 (CN);
G01R33/022 (CN);
G01R33/07 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SENSORANORDNUNG MIT EINEM JOYSTICK ODER EINEM THUMBSTICK | [2023/24] | English: | SENSOR ASSEMBLY WITH A JOYSTICK OR A THUMBSTICK | [2023/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE CAPTEUR DOTÉ D'UNE MANETTE DE JEU OU D'UN STICK ANALOGIQUE | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 15.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008258722 (ZON HANS [NL], et al); | [XI]US2015377648 (SIROHIWALA ALI HUSAIN YUSUF [US], et al); | [XI]US2016334830 (SIROHIWALA ALI HUSAIN YUSUF [US], et al); | [XI]US2020089334 (TOMPKINS GLEN JASON [US], et al) | by applicant | US2019179357 | EP20210180417 |