EP4194323 - MODULAR TRANSVERSE CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dura Automotive Systems GmbH Rathausplatz 4 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulze-Bergkamen, Burkhard 44287 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
Krehmke, Michael 58840 Plettenberg / DE | 03 /
Kahlert, Michael 51580 Reichshof / DE | 04 /
Thubauville, Andre 58515 Lüdenscheid / DE | 05 /
Rau, Holger 51580 Reichshof / DE | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | btb IP Bungartz Baltzer Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21213800.2 | 10.12.2021 | [2023/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194323 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/14, B62D29/00 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
B62D25/145 (EP);
B62D29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULQUERTRÄGER | [2023/24] | English: | MODULAR TRANSVERSE CARRIER | [2023/24] | French: | SUPPORT TRANSVERSALE MODULAIRE | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 14.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2001253368 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,12,15 * pos.30 (coupler) Fig.3c,d; paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0053]; figure -; claim - * [A] 5,10,13,14; | [XA]DE102005002829 (INTIER AUTOMOTIVE INTERIORS GM [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-12,15 * pos.15 & par.19 mit par.18 mit par.15; paragraphs [0004] - [0029]; figure -; claim - * [A] 4,5,13,14; | [XA]DE102006044699 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-15 * Par.5, Par.8, par.22-24 & Verstärkungselement Muffe 21; paragraphs [0003] - [0024]; figure -; claim - * [A] 4,5; | [A]DE102020134995 (HYUNDAI MOBIS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* Par.60, par.27, par.46; paragraphs [0011] - [0501]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE102008026138 | DE102014003143 |