EP4014796 - BAYONET PRESSURE COOKER PROVIDED WITH A CONTROL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARAILLE, Eric Laurent 21121 FONTAINE LES DIJON / FR | 02 /
CHAMEROY, Eric 21260 VERONNES / FR | 03 /
RHETAT, Eric Christian Jacques 21000 DIJON / FR | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Didier Martin, et al Les Terrasses des Bruyères - Bâtiment C 314 C, Allée des Noisetiers 69760 Limonest / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Weber, Jean-François, et al Cabinet Didier Martin Les Terrasses des Bruyères -Bâtiment C 314 C Allée des Noisetiers 69760 Limonest / FR | Application number, filing date | 21213858.0 | 10.12.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | FR20200013738 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: FR 2013738 | [2022/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4014796 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/08, A47J27/09 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A47J27/08 (EP);
A47J27/0806 (EP,CN,KR);
A47J27/0802 (EP,CN);
A47J27/0804 (EP);
A47J27/0815 (KR);
A47J27/09 (EP,CN);
A47J27/092 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLKOCHTOPF MIT BAJONETTVERSCHLUSS, DER MIT EINEM STEUERMODUL AUSGESTATTET IST | [2022/25] | English: | BAYONET PRESSURE COOKER PROVIDED WITH A CONTROL MODULE | [2022/25] | French: | AUTOCUISEUR A BAIONNETTE POURVU D'UN MODULE DE COMMANDE | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 21.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP2898800 (SEB SA [FR]) [Y] 1-9,13-15 * figures 1-7 *[A] 10-12; | [YA]EP3100652 (SEB SA [FR]) [Y] 1-9,13-15 * paragraph [0030]; figures 5-21 * [A] 10-12 |