EP4029412 - FRAUD BEHAVIOR RECOGNITION DEVICE, CONTROL PROGRAM THEREOF, AND FRAUD BEHAVIOR RECOGNITION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamura, Atsushi Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21214482.8 | 14.12.2021 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | JP20210004259 | 14.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021004259 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029412 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47F9/04, G07G3/00, H04N7/18, G07G1/00, G06Q20/20 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H04N7/188 (EP);
G07G3/003 (KR);
G07G1/0009 (CN);
G06Q20/206 (EP,US);
A47F9/047 (EP);
G06Q20/202 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4016 (EP);
G06V20/52 (KR);
G06V40/20 (US);
G06V40/28 (KR);
G07G1/0036 (KR);
G07G1/12 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETRUGSVERHALTENSERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERPROGRAMM DAFÜR UND BETRUGSVERHALTENSERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/29] | English: | FRAUD BEHAVIOR RECOGNITION DEVICE, CONTROL PROGRAM THEREOF, AND FRAUD BEHAVIOR RECOGNITION METHOD | [2022/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE DE COMPORTEMENT FRAUDULEUX, PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE DE COMPORTEMENT FRAUDULEUX | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 20.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011087535 (YOSHIZAWA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0236] * * paragraph [0256] - paragraph [0260] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2012169879 (LIBAL VIT [CZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] ** paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]US2014176719 (MIGDAL JOSHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0067] *; | [A]WO2020045196 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0091] * |