EP4023938 - BURNER ARRANGEMENT FOR A PRE-MIX BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, NO, RS | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Str. 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEVERS, Hendrik 50859 Köln / DE | 02 /
POLUS, Markus 45327 Essen / DE | 03 /
SCHWEITZER-DE BORTOLI, Stefan 41470 Neuss / DE | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/27] | 01 /
Gevers, Hendrik 50859 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
Polus, Markus 45327 Essen / DE | |||
03 /
Schweitzer-de Bortoli, Stefan 41470 Neuss / DE | Representative(s) | Popp, Carsten Vaillant GmbH IRP Berghauser Straße 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21214581.7 | 15.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | DE202110100007 | 04.01.2021 Original published format: DE102021100007 | [2022/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023938 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4023938 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F23C9/00, F23D14/02 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
F23D14/02 (EP);
F23C9/006 (EP);
F23C2202/10 (EP);
F23C2900/09002 (EP);
F23C2900/9901 (EP);
F23D2203/1012 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BRENNERANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN VORMISCHBRENNER | [2022/27] | English: | BURNER ARRANGEMENT FOR A PRE-MIX BURNER | [2022/27] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE BRÛLEUR POUR UN BRÛLEUR À PRÉMÉLANGE | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 05.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP0867659 (VTH VERFAHRENTECHNIK FUER HEIZ [LI]) [I] 1-4 * column 5, line 29 - column 7, line 7 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 1,2; | [IY]EP0970327 (VTH VERFAHRENTECHNIK FUER HEIZ [LI]) [I] 1-4 * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 18 * * page 17, line 6 - page 18, line 14 * * figures 2, 7-9 * [Y] 1,2; | [Y]EP3295083 (LOCHINVAR LLC [US]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 39] , [0 42] , [0 70] - [0073] ** figures 4, 5, 8, 10 * | by applicant | DE10064259 | WO2004102071 |