EP4019696 - INDUSTRIAL TEXTILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Technologies, Inc. Keilasatama 5 02150 Espoo / FI | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIKAINEN, Hannu 02150 Espoo / FI | 02 /
SEPPÄNEN, Mari 02150 Espoo / FI | 03 /
TAIPALE, Seppo 02150 Espoo / FI | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21214670.8 | 15.12.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | FI20200006371 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: FI 20206371 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019696 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4019696 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
D21F1/0045 (EP,FI);
D21F7/10 (KR);
D03D11/00 (CN,KR,US);
D03D1/00 (US);
D03D1/0094 (KR);
D03D13/00 (CN);
D03D3/04 (KR);
D21F1/0027 (KR);
D21F1/0036 (KR,US);
D21F1/10 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INDUSTRIEFASER | [2022/26] | English: | INDUSTRIAL TEXTILE | [2022/26] | French: | TEXTILE INDUSTRIEL | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 30.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5052448 (GIVIN WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 8, line 11 - column 9, line 10; figure 6 *; | [A]US6110850 (THURNER ALBERT [AT]) [A] 1-16* column 5, lines 8-45; figures 1g,2c *; | [A]WO03093573 (TAMFELT OYJ ABP [FI], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figures 1-11 * | by applicant | EP20160870051 |