EP4198196 - BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Technologies Oy Keilasatama 5 02150 Espoo / FI | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILOMAA, Tuuli 40700 Jyväskylä / FI | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21214802.7 | 15.12.2021 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198196 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
D21F3/0227 (EP);
D21F1/0027 (CN);
D21F7/08 (US);
D02G3/02 (US);
D02G3/447 (US);
D21F3/0236 (EP);
D10B2101/00 (US);
D10B2201/24 (US);
D10B2331/02 (US);
D10B2331/021 (US);
D10B2331/04 (US);
D10B2401/063 (US);
D10B2505/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GURT | [2023/25] | English: | BELT | [2023/25] | French: | COURROIE | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 26.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0238859 (YAMAUCHI CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 13* paragraph [0021] *; | [XAY]WO2020152392 (VALMET TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [X] 1-6,10-12,15 * page 10, line 14 - page 13, line 31; figure - * [A] 8,9 [Y] 7,13,14; | [Y]EP3913131 (VALMET TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [Y] 7,14 * paragraphs [0016] - [0030]; figure - * |