EP4197995 - PT-XANTHENE-IODINE COMPLEX AND PT-XANTHENE BROMINE COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Oxeno GmbH & Co. KG Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/25] | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Carolin 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
JACKSTELL, Ralf 18106 Rostock / DE | 03 /
BELLER, Matthias 18211 Ostseebad Nienhagen / DE | 04 /
FRANKE, Robert 45772 Marl / DE | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21215337.3 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4197995 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/00, C07F15/00 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
C07F15/0093 (EP,CN);
C07F15/0086 (KR,US);
B01J31/185 (KR);
B01J31/2247 (KR);
B01J31/2452 (CN);
C07C45/00 (EP);
C07C45/50 (KR);
C07C45/505 (CN);
C07C47/02 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/505, C07C47/02 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PT-XANTHEN-IOD-KOMPLEX UND PT-XANTHEN-BROM-KOMPLEX | [2023/25] | English: | PT-XANTHENE-IODINE COMPLEX AND PT-XANTHENE BROMINE COMPLEX | [2023/25] | French: | COMPLEXE PT-XANTHÈNE-IODE ET COMPLEXE PT-XANTHÈNE-BROME | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 26.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.02.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010129030 (CELANESE INT CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO2017191310 (BASF SE [DE]); |