EP4199112 - A METHOD FOR FORMING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Boon Teik 3012 Wilsele / BE | 02 /
VANDOOREN, Anne 5032 Mazy / BE | 03 /
RYCKAERT, Julien 1030 Schaerbeek / BE | 04 /
HORIGUCHI, Naoto 3000 Leuven / BE | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21215370.4 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199112 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/775, H01L27/092, H01L21/336, H01L21/8238, H01L21/822, H01L29/423, H01L29/06, // B82Y10/00 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
H01L29/66439 (EP);
H01L29/0642 (CN);
H01L21/823437 (US);
H01L21/8221 (EP);
H01L21/823878 (EP);
H01L29/0673 (EP,US);
H01L29/42392 (EP,US);
H01L29/66545 (EP,US);
H01L29/66553 (US);
H01L29/775 (EP);
H01L29/78696 (EP);
B82Y10/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS | [2023/25] | English: | A METHOD FOR FORMING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2023/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN DISPOSITIF À SEMICONDUCTEUR | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2019097011 (WU WEI-HAO [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,12,13 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1-17 * [A] 4,5,7-11 [Y] 6; | [A]US2020118892 (CHENG KANGGUO [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]US2020286788 (XIE RUILONG [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0092] * * figures 1-15 *; | [IAY]US2021296184 (XIE RUILONG [US], et al) [I] 1-5,11-13 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1-11 * [A] 7,8 [Y] 6,9,10 |