EP4024361 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PREDICTING ROAD CLOSURE IN A REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERE Global B.V. Kennedyplein 222 5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xu, Jingwei Chicago / US | 02 /
Guan, Yuxin Chicago / US | 03 /
Bernhardt, Bruce Chicago / US | 04 /
Huang, Weimin Chicago / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 21215867.9 | 20.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | US202017138583 | 30.12.2020 Original published format: US202017138583 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024361 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
G08G1/0112 (EP,US);
G08G1/0133 (EP,US);
G01C21/3492 (US);
G01C21/3691 (US);
G01C21/3815 (US);
G01C21/3841 (US);
G01C21/3889 (US);
G06V20/44 (EP);
G06V20/54 (EP);
G06V20/58 (EP);
G08G1/0141 (EP);
G08G1/04 (EP);
G08G1/052 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VORHERSAGE VON STRASSENSPERRUNGEN IN EINER REGION | [2022/27] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PREDICTING ROAD CLOSURE IN A REGION | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE PRÉDICTION DE FERMETURE DE ROUTE DANS UNE RÉGION | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 21.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US10140856 (BERNHARDT BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2019130742 (TOKUNAGA MASATAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]US2020105134 (PIETROBON DAVIDE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2020111349 (MUBAREK OMER [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0148] *; | [I]EP3648075 (HERE GLOBAL BV [NL]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] * |