EP4202758 - CODE READER AND METHOD FOR READING AN OPTICAL CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampf, Marcel 77955 Ettenheim / DE | 02 /
Schüler, Pascal 79331 Teningen / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21216207.7 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202758 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4202758 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/14 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G06K7/1452 (EP);
G06K7/146 (EP,KR);
G06K7/1443 (CN);
G06V30/153 (US);
G06K7/10821 (CN);
G06K7/1486 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | CODELESER UND VERFAHREN ZUM LESEN EINES OPTISCHEN CODES | [2023/26] | English: | CODE READER AND METHOD FOR READING AN OPTICAL CODE | [2023/26] | French: | LECTEUR DE CODE ET PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE D'UN CODE OPTIQUE | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 29.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012080515 (VAN DER MERWE RUDOLPH [US]); | [A]US2021073499 (SCHÜLER PASCAL [DE], et al) |