EP4016280 - METHOD FOR SYNCHRONISED READING BY DEVICES FOR REPRODUCING CHECKS BY A CONTROLLER, REPRODUCTION DEVICE AND CONTROLLER IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagemcom Broadband SAS 4 Allée des Messageries 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/11] | For all designated states Sagemcom Broadband SAS 4 Allée Des Messageries 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states SAGEMCOM BROADBAND SAS 250, route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Jérôme 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 3, impasse de la Vigie CS 71840 35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 21216210.1 | 21.12.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | FR20200013833 | 21.12.2020 Original published format: FR 2013833 | [2022/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016280 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4016280 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/10] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP4016280 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, H04N21/436 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISIERTES LESEVERFAHREN DURCH WIEDERGABEGERÄTE, DIE VON EINEM CONTROLLER GESTEUERT WERDEN, WIEDERGABEGERÄT UND CONTROLLER ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2022/25] | English: | METHOD FOR SYNCHRONISED READING BY DEVICES FOR REPRODUCING CHECKS BY A CONTROLLER, REPRODUCTION DEVICE AND CONTROLLER IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD | [2022/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE LECTURE SYNCHRONISEE PAR DES DISPOSITIFS DE REPRODUCTION CONTRÔLES PAR UN CONTRÔLEUR, DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION ET CONTRÔLEUR METTANT EN UVRE LEDIT PROCEDE | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 25.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2015094834 (VEGA LUIS [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,5,7-17 * figures 5, 7, 10-13 * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0186] * [A] 3,6; | [A]US10452345 (COBURN IV ARTHUR L [US], et al) [A] 1-17* column 21, line 40 - column 26, line 60 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Universal Plug and Play - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20140927), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Universal_Plug_and_Play&oldid=627277975, (20150428), XP055186185 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US9195258 |