EP4183273 - PAPER FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essentra Filter Products Development Co. Pte. Ltd. 36 Robinson Road Singapore 068877 / SG | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QOLBI, Rosi Ana Sidoarjo / ID | 02 /
RAHMAN, Arief Sidoarjo / ID | 03 /
GIYANTO Sidoarjo / ID | 04 /
RAMADHAN, Ilham Fadila Sidoarjo / ID | 05 /
ANINDYA, Ian Sidoarjo / ID | 06 /
FAHRONI, Agus Sidoarjo / ID | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/21] | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21216337.2 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/21] | Priority number, date | GB20210016870 | 23.11.2021 Original published format: GB 202116870 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4183273 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/04, A24D3/06 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
A24D3/04 (EP,KR);
A24D1/02 (EP,KR);
A24D1/20 (KR);
A24D3/068 (EP,KR);
A24D3/10 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] |
Former [2023/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAPIERFILTER | [2023/21] | English: | PAPER FILTER | [2023/21] | French: | FILTRE DE PAPIER | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 21.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB2118819 (FILTRONA LTD); | [YA]CN101448416 (FILTRONA INT LTD [GB]); | [Y]WO2012123702 (FILTRONA FILTER PROD DEV CO [SG], et al); | [YA]WO2013124475 (FILTRONA FILTER PROD DEV CO [SG], et al); |