EP4202673 - OFFLOADED DATA PROCESSING FOR NAMED BASED DATA TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPOCZYNSKI, Marcin Leixlip / IE | 02 /
FENG, Hao Hillsboro, 97124 / US | 03 /
GUPTA HYDE, Maruti Portland, 97219 / US | 04 /
HIMAYAT, Nageen Fremont, 94539 / US | 05 /
SRIKANTESWARA, Srikathyayani Portland, 97229 / US | 06 /
ZHANG, Yi Portland, 97229 / US | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21216922.1 | 22.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202673 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, H04L67/63 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H04L67/63 (EP);
G06F9/5027 (EP);
G06F2209/509 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGELAGERTE DATENVERARBEITUNG FÜR NAMENBASIERTE DATENÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2023/26] | English: | OFFLOADED DATA PROCESSING FOR NAMED BASED DATA TRANSMISSIONS | [2023/26] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES DÉCHARGÉES POUR DES TRANSMISSIONS DE DONNÉES NOMMÉES | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 29.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2020412836 (ARROBO VIDAL GABRIEL [US], et al); | [A]US2021314232 (NAINAR NAGENDRA KUMAR [US], et al) |