EP4002866 - A DEVICE AND METHOD TO ESTABLISH A SCORE FOR A COMPUTER APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXTREME NETWORKS, INC. 6480 Via Del Oro San Jose, CA 95119 / US | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KJENDAL, David Salem, 03079 / US | 02 /
NISPEL, Markus Salem, 03079 / US | 03 /
GRAHAM, Richard Salem, 03079 / US | 04 /
EATON, Ernie Salem, 03079 / US | 05 /
HASKELL, Jeffrey Salem, 03079 / US | 06 /
RASH, Michael Salem, 03079 / US | 07 /
WOODHEAD, Jamie Salem, 03079 / US | 08 /
BOSA, Patrick Salem, 03079 / US | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 21217155.7 | 13.03.2014 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | US201313836545 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313836545 | US201313835679 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313835679 | US201313836195 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313836195 | US201313836048 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313836048 | US201313836371 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313836371 | US201313835815 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313835815 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002866 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04L43/12 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
H04L43/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER BEWERTUNG FÜR EINE COMPUTER-APPLIKATION | [2022/21] | English: | A DEVICE AND METHOD TO ESTABLISH A SCORE FOR A COMPUTER APPLICATION | [2022/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME D'ASSIGNER UN SCORE POUR UNE APPLICATION INFORMATIQUE | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14769851.8 / EP2974355 | EP19152626.8 / EP3499908 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1715624 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [Y]US7895295 (THAKUR BRAJENDRA SINGH [US], et al); | [Y]US8291495 (BURNS BRYAN [US], et al) |