EP4201697 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DECORATED WALL OR FLOOR PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch / DE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENDLING, Peter 56290 Mörsdorf / DE | 02 /
HANNIG, Hans-Jürgen 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21217444.5 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201697 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B44C5/04 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
B44C5/0453 (EP);
B29D7/01 (CN);
B29C48/21 (EP);
B29C48/07 (EP);
B29C48/08 (EP);
B29C48/355 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DEKORIERTEN WAND- ODER BODENPANEELS | [2023/26] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DECORATED WALL OR FLOOR PANEL | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU DÉCORÉ MURAL OU DE SOL | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 28.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Divisional application(s) | EP24152521.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2031780 (ALCAN ALUMINUM CORP [US]); | [A]US6333094 (SCHNEIDER MANFRED [DE], et al); | [XI]US2008010924 (PIETRUCZYNIK CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al); | [A]EP3702172 (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) |