EP3995073 - COMPENSATING FOR DISRUPTIONS IN BREATHING GAS FLOW MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited College Business & Technology Park Cruiserath, Blanchardstown Dublin 15 / IE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACKER, Jaron, M. Madison, 53703 / US | 02 /
TOLMIE, Craig, R Stoughton, 53589 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21217486.6 | 31.01.2017 | [2022/19] | Priority number, date | US201662290430P | 02.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662290430 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995073 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61M16/00, A61M16/10, A61M16/12, A61M16/20 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A61M16/125 (EP,KR,US);
A61M16/024 (EP,KR,US);
A61M16/12 (CN);
A61M16/0051 (KR,US);
A61M16/0069 (KR,US);
A61M16/1005 (CN);
A61M16/104 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2016/0033 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2016/102 (CN);
A61M2016/1025 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2016/1035 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2202/0275 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0275, A61M2202/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] |
Former [2022/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMPENSIEREN VON UNTERBRECHUNGEN BEI ATEMGASDURCHFLUSSMESSUNGEN | [2022/19] | English: | COMPENSATING FOR DISRUPTIONS IN BREATHING GAS FLOW MEASUREMENT | [2022/19] | French: | COMPENSATION DES INTERRUPTIONS DANS UNE MESURE DE DÉBIT DE GAZ RESPIRATOIRE | [2022/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 10.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17748014.2 / EP3410927 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015314101 (ACKER JARON M [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0039] *[I] 13,14; | [XI]US2015320952 (ACKER JARON M [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0050] * [I] 13-15 | by applicant | US5558083 |