EP4202492 - VEHICLE LOCALIZATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Autonomous Solutions AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGQUIST, Stefan 417 27 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
HAGVALL, Linus 418 74 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
GRANTE, Christian 426 68 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21217602.8 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202492 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/87, G01S13/86 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G01S13/876 (EP);
B60W50/0205 (US);
B60W40/12 (US);
G01S13/86 (EP);
H04W4/025 (US);
H04W4/40 (US);
B60W2300/125 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLOKALISIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/26] | English: | VEHICLE LOCALIZATION SYSTEM | [2023/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LOCALISATION DE VÉHICULE | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 18.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013193276 (HUNTER BRADLEY [US]) [X] 1-6,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0040] - [0042]; figures 1, 11 * [I] 7-9,11; | [XI]US2017074964 (XU JINGWEI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 3-9,11; | [I]US2019080612 (WEISSMAN HAIM MENDEL [IL], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0051] , [0068] , [0091]; figures 1, 2, 7-16 * |