EP4202468 - DIRECT INFERENCE BASED ON UNDERSAMPLED MRI DATA OF HUMANS OR ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orbem GmbH Lichtenbergstraße 8 85748 Garching b.Munich / DE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coello Uribe, Jorge Eduardo 80802 München / DE | 02 /
Kudielka, Guido 71384 Weinstadt / DE | 03 /
Gómez Damián, Pedro Agustín 80802 München / DE | 04 /
Laparidou, Maria 80634 München / DE | 05 /
Molina Romero, Miguel 80939 München / DE | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Pelster Behrends Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Bosch-Straße 17b 48153 Münster / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21217639.0 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202468 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/56, A61B5/055, G01R33/561, G06T7/00, G06V10/764, // G06N3/02 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G01R33/5608 (EP);
A61B5/055 (EP);
A61B5/7267 (EP);
G01R33/561 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (EP);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/70 (EP);
G06N3/09 (EP);
G06N5/01 (EP);
G06N5/025 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP);
G06T2207/10088 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30096 (EP);
G06V10/82 (EP);
G06V2201/031 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIREKTE INFERENZ BASIEREND AUF UNTERABGETASTETEN MRT-DATEN VON MENSCHEN ODER TIEREN | [2023/26] | English: | DIRECT INFERENCE BASED ON UNDERSAMPLED MRI DATA OF HUMANS OR ANIMALS | [2023/26] | French: | INFÉRENCE DIRECTE BASÉE SUR DES DONNÉES D'IRM SOUS-ÉCHANTILLONNÉES D'HUMAINS OU D'ANIMAUX | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/22] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2016364857 (REICHER MURRAY A [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] ** paragraph [0045] *; | [XAYI]US2020026967 (KARTOUN URI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,10-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1,2,4,5 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * [A] 4,5 [Y] 7 [I] 9; | [XYI]CN113687285 (HANGZHOU WEIYING MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-6,11-15 * page 2 - page 10 * [Y] 7 [I] 8-10 | by applicant | WO2019092265 | US2020305756 | EP3704666 | US2021224634 | US11170543 |