EP4024725 - ADAPTATION OF COORDINATED RADIO FREQUENCY TRANSMISSIONS AND RECEPTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Collins, Inc. 400 Collins Road NE Cedar Rapids, IA 52498 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORGENSON, Mark B. Ottawa, Ontario / CA | 02 /
STEVENS, James A. Lucas, TX / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21218114.3 | 29.12.2021 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | US202017139362 | 31.12.2020 Original published format: US202017139362 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024725 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4024725 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, // H04B7/026, H04L1/00 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04B7/026 (EP,US);
H04B7/024 (US);
H04B7/043 (US);
H04B7/15528 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W84/18 (US);
H04B7/0689 (EP);
H04L1/06 (EP);
H04L2001/0097 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANPASSUNG VON KOORDINIERTEN HOCHFREQUENZÜBERTRAGUNGEN UND -EMPFÄNGEN | [2022/27] | English: | ADAPTATION OF COORDINATED RADIO FREQUENCY TRANSMISSIONS AND RECEPTIONS | [2022/27] | French: | ADAPTATION D'ÉMISSIONS ET DE RÉCEPTIONS DE FRÉQUENCE RADIO COORDONNÉES | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 28.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018139016 (MOSHFEGHI MEHRAN [US]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0083] * * figure 6 * [I] 2-9,11-15; | [XI]US2019363776 (MUROTA KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 3-5 * [I] 2-9,11-15; | [XI]US2020169995 (NAM WOOSEOK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-13,15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0093] * * figures 1, 3A, 3B, 4, 5 * [I] 4,6,14; | [XI] - JENEKAR SANJEENANI ET AL, "MIMO System Using Transmit Diversity and Relay Selection Algorithm", 2013 THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCES IN COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE, (20130829), doi:10.1109/ICACC.2013.75, pages 351 - 354, XP032534486 [X] 1,10 * sections III, IV * [I] 2-9,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICACC.2013.75 | [XI] - HONGLIN HU ET AL, "Wireless Mesh Networking, Multiple Antenna Techniques for Wireless Mesh Networks", WIRELESS MESH NETWORKING, XX, XX, (20060101), pages 1 - 28, XP002473046 [X] 1,10 * section 11.2 * [I] 2-9,11-15 | by applicant | US4639937 |