EP4122539 - MASK APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Yongmin 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hojung 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
AN, Dongkwon 08592 Seoul / KR | 04 /
MUN, Yeongcheol 08592 Seoul / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Chiyoung 08592 Seoul / KR | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21218246.3 | 30.12.2021 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | KR20210093938 | 19.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210093938 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4122539 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4122539 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/00, A62B18/02, A62B18/08 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
A62B18/006 (EP,KR,US);
A62B18/025 (EP,KR);
A62B18/08 (KR,US);
A62B18/084 (EP,KR);
A62B23/02 (KR,US);
A62B7/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | MASKENVORRICHTUNG | [2023/04] | English: | MASK APPARATUS | [2023/04] | French: | APPAREIL DE MASQUE | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 09.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5016625 (HSU CHI-HSUEH [TW], et al); | [XI]KR102256713B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [P]EP3919131 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | by applicant | KR20210093938 |