EP4206539 - COMBUSTOR ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE ASSEMBLY, GAS TURBINE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTOR ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia Switzerland AG Haselstrasse 18 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WICKSTROEM, Anders 5400 BADEN / CH | 02 /
CIANI, Andrea 5400 BADEN / CH | 03 /
WOOD, John 5400 BADEN / CH | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Corso Magenta, 56 20123 Milano / IT | [2024/38] |
Former [2023/27] | Andreotti, Erika, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21218413.9 | 30.12.2021 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4206539 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4206539 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/34, F02C3/30, F23D11/10 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
F23R3/346 (EP);
F23R3/286 (CN);
F02C3/30 (EP);
F23L7/002 (EP);
F23L7/005 (EP);
F23C2900/9901 (EP);
F23D2900/14681 (EP);
F23L2900/07008 (EP);
F23L2900/07009 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BRENNKAMMERANORDNUNG FÜR EINE GASTURBINENANORDNUNG, GASTURBINENANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKAMMERANORDNUNG FÜR EINE GASTURBINENANORDNUNG | [2023/27] | English: | COMBUSTOR ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE ASSEMBLY, GAS TURBINE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTOR ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE ASSEMBLY | [2023/27] | French: | ENSEMBLE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION POUR ENSEMBLE DE TURBINE À GAZ, ENSEMBLE TURBINE À GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN ENSEMBLE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION POUR ENSEMBLE TURBINE À GAZ | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 05.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4955191 (OKAMOTO HIROAKI [JP], et al); | [X]US6089024 (HATANAKA TAKEFUMI [JP]); | [X]US2002056276 (DALLA BETTA RALPH A [US], et al); | [X]US2010077720 (POYYAPAKKAM MADHAVAN NARASIMHA [CH], et al) |