EP4140607 - METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOILS AND SLURRIES CONTAMINATED BY HEAVY METALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holcim Technology Ltd Im Schachen 5113 Holderbank / CH | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serclerat, Ivan 38070 St Quentin Fallavier / FR | 02 /
Tapsoba, Nouffou 38070 St Quentin Fallavier / FR | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Europe LLP Neumarkter Straße 18 81673 München / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21290052.6 | 27.08.2021 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140607 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B09C1/08 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
B09C1/08 (EP);
C04B28/06 (EP);
C04B28/105 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/06, C04B14/304, C04B14/361, C04B18/0472, C04B40/0028, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/0086, C04B2103/302 (EP);
C04B28/105, C04B7/32, C04B14/361, C04B18/0472, C04B22/14, C04B24/2652, C04B40/0028, C04B40/0608 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DURCH SCHWERMETALLE VERUNREINIGTEN BÖDEN UND SCHLÄMMEN | [2023/09] | English: | METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOILS AND SLURRIES CONTAMINATED BY HEAVY METALS | [2023/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SOLS ET DE SUSPENSIONS CONTAMINÉS PAR DES MÉTAUX LOURDS | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002059141 (SUMITOMO METAL IND, et al); | [A]JP2005238207 (ASTEC KK, et al) |