EP4083144 - MICA PARTICULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ImerTech SAS 43 Quai de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAKOB, Alexandra 31300 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
INEICH, Théodore 31300 Toulouse / FR | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 21305542.9 | 27.04.2021 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4083144 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, // C08K3/34 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
C09C1/405 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/22 (US);
C08K3/34 (US);
C09C1/0018 (EP,KR);
C01P2004/51 (EP,KR);
C01P2004/54 (EP,KR);
C01P2004/60 (EP,KR);
C01P2004/61 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2323/12 (US);
C08K2201/003 (EP,KR);
C08K2201/006 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLIMMERPARTIKEL | [2022/44] | English: | MICA PARTICULATES | [2022/44] | French: | PARTICULES DE MICA | [2022/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/41] | 26.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2018187638 (IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC [US]); | [XA]EP3778770 (IMERTECH SAS [FR]); | [E]EP3868357 (IMERTECH SAS [FR]) | by applicant | US5576617 | WO2013015841 |