EP4174144 - WATER-BASED SOLID MARKING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société BIC 12-22, boulevard Victor Hugo 92110 Clichy / FR | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONCEDIEU, Damien 92110 CLICHY / FR | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21306524.6 | 29.10.2021 | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174144 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4174144 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/16, C09D13/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
C09D11/16 (EP);
C09D13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WASSERBASIERTE FESTE MARKIERUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/18] | English: | WATER-BASED SOLID MARKING COMPOSITION | [2023/18] | French: | COMPOSITION SOLIDE DE MARQUAGE À BASE D'EAU | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 31.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0513498 (BUNCHO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * example - *; | [A]US5460647 (SNEDEKER COLIN M [US], et al) [A] 1-15* example - *; | [AD]EP0742273 (BUNCHO CORP [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15 * example - *; | [A]US2007204760 (SEKI KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * example - *; | [A]JP2009286860 (BUNCHO CORP, et al) [A] 1-15 * example - * | by applicant | US5725642 | EP1342761 |