EP4184391 - NEURAL NETWORK AND METHOD FOR VARIATIONAL INFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives 25 Rue Leblanc Bat Le Ponant 75015 Paris / FR | [2024/44] |
Former [2023/21] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALGATY, Thomas 91191 GIF-SUR-YVETTE CEDEX / FR | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21306611.1 | 19.11.2021 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184391 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N7/00, G06N3/08, // G06N3/063 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N3/049 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/048 (EP);
G06N3/063 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2023/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEURONALES NETZWERK UND VERFAHREN ZUR VARIATIONSINFERENZ | [2023/21] | English: | NEURAL NETWORK AND METHOD FOR VARIATIONAL INFERENCE | [2023/21] | French: | RÉSEAU NEURONAL ET PROCÉDÉ D'INFÉRENCE VARIATIONNELLE | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 02.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - BLEEMA ROSENFELD ET AL, "Spiking Generative Adversarial Networks With a Neural Network Discriminator: Local Training, Bayesian Models, and Continual Meta-Learning", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20211102), XP091095072 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * section I, II, III, V * | [A] - EMRE NEFTCI ET AL, "Event-driven contrastive divergence for spiking neuromorphic systems", FRONTIERS IN NEUROSCIENCE, (20140130), vol. 7, no. 272, doi:10.3389/fnins.2013.00272, XP055218818 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * section 2.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnins.2013.00272 | [A] - HYERYUNG JANG ET AL, "BiSNN: Training Spiking Neural Networks with Binary Weights via Bayesian Learning", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20201215), XP081838811 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * sections 2, 3 * | [A] - GUO SHANGQI ET AL, "Hierarchical Bayesian Inference and Learning in Spiking Neural Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CYBERNETICS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 49, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TCYB.2017.2768554, ISSN 2168-2267, (20190101), pages 133 - 145, (20181213), XP011700733 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * sections I, V.B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCYB.2017.2768554 | by applicant | - NEAL, RADFORD M., Bayesian learning for neural networks, Springer Science & Business Media, (20120000), vol. 118 | - G.E.P. BOXM.E. MULLER, "A note on the generation of random normal deviates", Annals of Mathematical Statistics, (19580000), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 610 - 611 | - EMRE 0.HESHAM MOSTAFAFRIEDEMANN ZENKE, "Surrogate gradient learning in spiking neural networks: Bringing the power of gradient-based optimization to spiking neural networks", IEEE Signal Processing Magazine, (20190000), vol. 36, no. 6, doi:10.1109/MSP.2019.2931595, pages 51 - 63, XP011754849 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSP.2019.2931595 | - WERBOS, PAUL J., "Backpropagation through time: what it does and how to do it.", Proceedings of the IEEE, (19900000), vol. 78, no. 10, doi:10.1109/5.58337, pages 1550 - 1560, XP000171187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.58337 | - PARISI, GERMAN I., "Continual lifelong learning with neural networks:A review.", Neural Networks, (20190000), vol. 113, doi:10.1016/j.neunet.2019.01.012, pages 54 - 71, XP055819840 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neunet.2019.01.012 |