EP4198615 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN OPHTHALMIC LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essilor International 147 Rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-Le-Pont / FR | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIEGEL, Daniel 424796 Singapore / SG | 02 /
DROBE, Bjorn 339346 Singapore / SG | 03 /
GOULET, Alain 94490 Ormesson sur Marne / FR | 04 /
FRICKER, Sébastien 94000 Creteil / FR | 05 /
GUILLOT, Matthieu 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21306806.7 | 16.12.2021 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198615 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
G02C7/024 (EP);
G02C2202/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES BRILLENGLASES | [2023/25] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN OPHTHALMIC LENS | [2023/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE LENTILLE OPHTALMIQUE | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012173891 (VISIONEERING TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1934648 (CARL ZEISS VISION AU HOLDING [AU], et al); | [X]DE102009053467 (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE]); | [XI]EP3472661 (ZEISS CARL VISION INT GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2021198362 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) | by applicant | US2007011543 | EP2069854 |