EP4000670 - ELECTRONIC SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING FAILURE OF A SECOND SWITCH IN A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gledhill, Richard Paul Warwick / GB | 02 /
Jenkins, Daniel Paul Warwick / GB | 03 /
Marsh, William Geoffrey Arthur Warwick / GB | 04 /
Morris, Anthony Paul Warwick / GB | 05 /
O'Hare, Aidan Michael Warwick / GB | 06 /
Veasey, Robert Frederick Warwick / GB | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Sanofi Aventis Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst Geb. K703 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 21315085.7 | 20.05.2021 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | EP20200315451 | 16.11.2020 Original published format: EP 20315451 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000670 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/315 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP);
A61M5/31551 (EP);
A61M2205/3561 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES AUSFALLS EINES ZWEITEN SCHALTERS IN EINER MEDIKAMENTENABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/21] | English: | ELECTRONIC SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING FAILURE OF A SECOND SWITCH IN A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | [2022/21] | French: | SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE DÉFAILLANCE D'UN SECOND COMMUTATEUR DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 14.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2020176319 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [E]WO2021191326 (SANOFI SA [FR]) | by applicant | EP2890435 | EP2729202 | WO2019101962 | EP20200315066 | EP20200315305 | EP20200315357 | EP20200315451 | EP20210315002 |