EP4047070 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BIO-BASED ADHESIVES FROM RENEWABLE RESOURCES, AND THEIR USE FOR MANUFACTURING PLYWOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORESA TECHNOLOGIES, S.L.U. Av. Doña Urraca 91 36650 Caldas de Reis Pontevedra / ES | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNÁNDEZ FONDEVILA, LUCIANO 36650 PONTEVEDRA / ES | 02 /
LOPEZ-SUEVOS FRAGUELA, FRANCISCO 36650 PONTEVEDRA / ES | 03 /
VIZ RODRIGUEZ, FELIPE 36650 PONTEVEDRA / ES | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 21382147.3 | 23.02.2021 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047070 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09J189/00, C09J197/00, C09J199/00 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
C09J189/00 (EP);
C09J197/00 (EP);
C09J199/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT BIOBASIERTEN KLEBSTOFFEN AUS ERNEUERBAREN RESSOURCEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SPERRHOLZ | [2022/34] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BIO-BASED ADHESIVES FROM RENEWABLE RESOURCES, AND THEIR USE FOR MANUFACTURING PLYWOOD | [2022/34] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ADHÉSIVES COMPRENANT DES ADHÉSIFS BIOLOGIQUES À PARTIR DE RESSOURCES RENOUVELABLES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LA FABRICATION DE CONTREPLAQUÉ | [2022/34] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/32] | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013240114 (BALOGH JEFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 10-13* paragraphs [0005] , [0041] , [0057] - [0063] - [0083] - [0090] - [0105] , [0140] , [0168]; claims 1,3,16 *; | [XYI]US2016096985 (KNIGHT JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,14,15 * paragraphs [0040] - [0041] - [ 0049] - [0050]; example 5 * [Y] 10-13 [I] 3-5,7,9 | by applicant | - A. PIZZI, J. Adhesion Sci. Technol, (20060000), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 829 - 846 | - JI XIAODI et al., Royal Society Open Science, (20180000), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 172002,1 - 172002,11 | - FATEMEH FERDOSIAN et al., Polymers, (20170000), vol. 9, page 70 | - ROUX DGFERREIRA DBOTHA JJ. FOREST, Products. Journal, (19800000), vol. 26, page 27 | - ROUX DGFERREIRA DBOTHA JJ, Journal of Agricultural and Food Chemistry, (19800000), vol. 28, page 216 | - ROUX DGFERREIRA DHUNDT HKLMALAN E, Applied Polymer Symposium, (19750000), vol. 28, page 335 | - YAZAKI, Y.HILLIS, W.E., "Molecular size distribution of radiata pine bark extracts and its effects on properties", Holzforschung, (19800000), vol. 34, pages 125 - 130 | - CAS, no. 11138-66-2 | - KAWALERCZYK, "Flour fillers in plywood", BioResources, (20190000), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 6727 - 6735 |