EP4086587 - COUPLED-CORE OPTICAL FIBER WITH FIBER BRAGG GRATING AND SENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad Del Pais Vasco Euskal Herriko Unibertsitatea Barrio Sarriena s/n 48940 Leioa (Vizcaya) / ES | For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Servicio de Promoción y Apoyo a Investigación Innovación y Transferencia i2T Camí de Vera, s/n Edificio 8G - Acceso A - Planta 3 46022 Valencia / ES | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villatoro Bernardo, Agustín Joel 48940 Vizcaya / ES | 02 /
Sales Maicas, Salvador 46022 Valencia / ES | 03 /
Madrigal Madrigal, Javier 46022 Valencia / ES | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21382402.2 | 04.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086587 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/353 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G01D5/35316 (EP);
G01D5/35374 (EP);
G01D5/3538 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FASER MIT GEKOPPELTEM KERN MIT FASER-BRAGG-GITTER UND ABTASTVORRICHTUNG | [2022/45] | English: | COUPLED-CORE OPTICAL FIBER WITH FIBER BRAGG GRATING AND SENSING DEVICE | [2022/45] | French: | FIBRE OPTIQUE À NOYAU COUPLÉ AVEC RÉSEAU DE BRAGG ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/42] | 01.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN111121837 (UNIV GUILIN ELECTRONIC TECH) [X] 1,4-11,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,12,13; | [XI]CN111121838 (UNIV GUILIN ELECTRONIC TECH) [X] 1,2,4-15 * the whole document * [I] 3; | [ID] - YAKUSHIN SERGEY S. ET AL, "A study of bending effect on the femtosecond-pulse inscribed fiber Bragg gratings in a dual-core fiber", OPTICAL FIBER TECHNOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (201807), vol. 43, doi:10.1016/j.yofte.2018.04.001, ISSN 1068-5200, pages 101 - 105, XP055842589 [ID] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yofte.2018.04.001 | by applicant | US7512291 | - S. S. YAKUSHIN et al., "A study of bending effect on the femtosecond-pulse inscribed fiber Bragg gratings in a dual-core fiber", Optical Fiber Technology, (20180000), vol. 43, pages 101 - 105 |