EP4102700 - MODULATION MODE FOR A SWITCHING POWER CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy Innovation & Technology S.L. Avenida de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21382520.1 | 11.06.2021 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102700 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, H02M3/335 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H02M1/0058 (EP);
H02M3/1582 (EP);
H02M3/1584 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULATIONSMODUS FÜR EINEN SCHALTSTROMRICHTER | [2022/50] | English: | MODULATION MODE FOR A SWITCHING POWER CONVERTER | [2022/50] | French: | MODE DE MODULATION POUR CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE À COMMUTATION | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004239299 (VINCIARELLI PATRIZIO [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076]; figures 3,7-13 * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0092] * [I] 9; | [XI]US2015171744 (FABBRO SIMONE [IT]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] *[I] 6; | [XI]US2017194854 (CHERKASSKY ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraph [0039]; figures 3-8 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * [I] 6 | by applicant | - S. WAFFLERJ. W. KOLAR, "A Novel Low-Loss Modulation Strategy for High-Power Bidirectional Buck + Boost Converters", IEEE Transactions on Power Electronics, (20090600), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 1589 - 1599, XP011262259 |